THE ROSE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1169516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 22 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download