THE TATTENHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1168238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £36.07k £43.96k £44.03k £36.79k
Total expenditure £0 £13.02k £41.81k £38.00k £40.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A