YOUTH ON THE MOVE (LONDON)

Charity number: 1171778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 August 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2020 12 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 26 August 2019 09 July 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2019 09 July 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 26 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 26 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download