BARNES RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1168231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 26 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 05 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late Download