THE BAR AND MOOTING SOCIETY OF KING'S COLLEGE LONDON

Charity number: 1168665
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 February 2018 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 February 2018 10 days late Download