Financial history MANCHESTER CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1168839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £29.27k £23.51k £45.01k £64.13k £79.37k
Total expenditure £42.00k £47.20k £39.97k £66.40k £55.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k