FRIENDS OF WINCOBANK HILL

Charity number: 1168993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 July 2018 On time Download