WIGAN STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of Christians from the Borough of Wigan who as Wigan Street Pastors form part of the Urban Trinity (Church, Police and Local Government) patroling our Town Centre on specific evenings to Listen, Care and Help visitors to the Town to help make it a safer place
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 18 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK LEWIS | Chair | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Davies | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samantha Nicholson | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sheila MacInally | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE A'HEARNE | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66k | £240 | £282 | £240 | £220 | |
|
Total expenditure | £767 | £219 | £219 | £1.50k | £247 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2022 | 682 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2022 | 682 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION ARE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA OF WIGAN BOROUGH AND BEYOND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AS FOLLOWS: 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STREET PASTOR LICENSE AGREEMENT WITH THE "ASCENSION TRUST" THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC PASTORAL CARE SERVICES TO HELP PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND OTHER PUBLIC PLACES, GIVING GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING WHICH ASSIST IN PRESERVING PUBLIC ORDER, AVOID ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AND BY (II) ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ECCLESIASTICAL RELEVANCE TO COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC LIFE, MOBILIZING THE CHURCH ECUMENICALLY TO UNITY OF WORSHIP AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY CARRYING OUT THE MISSION AND OUTREACH WORK OF THE GOSPEL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN OUR COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE, THROUGH THE PRACTICAL DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH FORMAL TRAINING, INFORMAL TALKS AND CAPACITY BUILDING IN VOLUNTARY SERVICES, ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND THE STREET PASTOR URBAN TRINITY PRINCIPLE OF CHURCH, POLICE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT WORKING TOGETHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Leacroft
Ashton-in-Makerfield
WIGAN
WN4 0LN
- Phone:
- 07733117709
- Email:
- wigan@streetpastors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window