Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE MATERNITY STREAM OF THE CITY OF SANCTUARY CIO

Charity number: 1169883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window