Financial history YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE MATERNITY STREAM OF THE CITY OF SANCTUARY CIO

Charity number: 1169883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.95k £235 £5.60k £10.44k £7.61k
Total expenditure £4.39k £5.14k £6.19k £9.18k £7.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £400 N/A