ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK

Charity number: 1173050
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's aims are to establish, maintain, and advance the Roman Catholic religion in the area of the Archdiocese, or in connection with the Archdiocese of Southwark. The practical aims are to support the parochial and diocesan structure of the Catholic Church as set out from time to time in the rules and regulations of the Church, known as the code of Canon Law.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Medway
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE SOUTHWARK (Previous name)
  • ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Joseph Whitehouse Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Monsignor Gerald Joseph Ewing Trustee 23 March 2022
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
The Most Reverend John Wilson Trustee 25 July 2019
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON
Received: On time
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time
BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON)
Received: On time
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL
Received: On time
DEPTFORD POOR FUND
Received: On time
DUFFY BEQUEST
Received: On time
REDMOND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
HAYNES BEQUEST
Received: On time
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST
Received: On time
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST
Received: On time
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST
Received: On time
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
ROBINSON BEQUEST
Received: On time
CANON TIERNEY TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND
Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE
Received: On time
BENEDICT PIUS ANDRADI Trustee 26 March 2018
HYMNS ANCIENT AND MODERN LIMITED
Received: On time
Rt Rev Paul Joseph Hendricks Trustee 26 March 2018
ST JOHN'S SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN MUSLIM FORUM
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND
Received: On time
MARY NEY Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record
Sheila Wheeler Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.87m £23.54m £26.39m £36.37m £29.86m
Total expenditure £32.75m £26.03m £26.30m £27.49m £30.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.18m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £22.31m £17.50m £20.11m £27.47m £24.19m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £820.17k £1.73m £1.84m
Income - Charitable activities £696.13k £89.45k £1.39m £716.26k £912.80k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.35m £2.44m £2.65m £2.62m £2.92m
Income - Other £6.50m £3.51m £1.34m £3.84m £0
Income - Legacies £1.41m £987.34k £1.56m £1.57m £1.90m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £32.47m £25.81m £26.07m £27.20m £30.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £275.12k £222.58k £229.90k £292.09k £275.90k
Expenditure - Governance £58.04k £59.02k £60.00k £129.34k £67.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £156.04k £132.84k £0 £0 £161.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £39.02m £38.91m £103.36m £39.62m £39.30m
Long-term investments £46.97m £60.54m £0 £59.14m £62.45m
Other assets £9.18m £12.78m £16.45m £29.61m £23.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.04m £11.28m £13.00m £16.41m £10.42m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 December 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 December 2024 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 May 2023 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 May 2023 192 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MARCH 1920 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS OF 31 MAY 1955 AND 5 JUNE 1969
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION BY ECCLESIASTICAL EDUCATION, PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE RELIEF OF POOR ROMAN CATHOLICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 June 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
R C DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK
FINANCE OFFICE
59 WESTMINSTER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7JE
Phone:
02079602521