Accounts and annual returns SANDWELL AND BIRMINGHAM KURDISH COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1170258
Charity reporting is up to date (279 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 29 September 2022 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 289 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 25 February 2021 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | 25 February 2021 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2018 | 25 February 2020 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2018 | 25 February 2020 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window