AL MARIFA AL MADAR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LISTENING AND SUPPORTING THE PEOPLE WHO ARE ISOLATED OR DEPRESSED AND PROVIDING ADVICE ON SERVICES AND WELFARE BENEFITS TO THOSE WHO DO NOT SPEAK ENGLISH. TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF ISLAMIC VALUES AND CULTURE, WITH A VIEW TO INCREASED UNDERSTANDING AND PROMOTING DIVERSITY AND HARMONY IN A MULTI-CULTURAL COMMUNITY;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED UMER SHEIKH | Chair | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Sadiq | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRFAN SADIQ | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £430 | £537 | £976 | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £255 | £459 | £537 | £842 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 July 2020 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 July 2020 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF ISLAMIC VALUES AND CULTURE, WITH A VIEW TO INCREASED UNDERSTANDING AND PROMOTING DIVERSITY AND HARMONY IN A MULTI-CULTURAL COMMUNITY; 2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN THE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BY LISTENING AND SUPPORTING PEOPLE WHO ARE ISOLATED OR DEPRESSED AND PROVIDING ADVICE ON SERVICES AND WELFARE BENEFITS TO THOSE WHO DO NOT SPEAK ENGLISH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Holly Bank
Currier Lane
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Lancashire
OL6 6TH
- Phone:
- 07943055677
- Email:
- almarifaalmadar@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window