BRECKNOCK FEDERATION OF YFC

Charity number: 1169501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 October 2017 On time Download