Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST MARY THE VIRGIN, ISLEWORTH

Charity number: 1168356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £136.18k £471.59k £289.33k £91.90k £113.11k
Total expenditure £126.77k £123.97k £143.64k £139.49k £145.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.85k