Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, MILL HILL
Charity number: 1168446

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEVEN PETER YOUNG | Chair | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Asamoah-Danso | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Emenike Ejelonu | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Parnaby | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Heather Betts | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Enitan Adegbite | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Barton | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter John McCabery | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Izzard | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ASQUITH | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN MARY SEMLYEN | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.