THE WELCOME DIRECTORY

Charity number: 1169014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 February 2020 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 February 2018 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time Download