HOLYWELL LEISURE CENTRE/CANOLFAN HAMDDEN TREFFYNNON

Charity number: 1170729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide for public use a wide range of facilities for various competitive sports, personal fitness, leisure, recreational and learning activities based around its : Swimming pools, Gymnasium, Sports hall, Community/Dance studio, Cafe, Soft Play area, Library, Meeting rooms and Health Suite together with access to Ysgol Treffynnon High School Sports hall & 4G pitch.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Flintshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leonard Edward Jones Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Dr Mark Rowlands Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Carmel Ann McCarth Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
ADAM PARRY Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
PAUL ISLIP Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
MAGALI LOVELL-PASCAL Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £825.28k £698.89k £760.34k £877.79k £972.90k
Total expenditure £792.75k £637.36k £751.67k £919.21k £978.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £134.07k £597.55k £250.68k £196.94k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £134.07k £597.55k £250.68k £196.96k £162.45k
Income - Other trading activities £663.30k £83.79k £475.32k £656.54k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £774.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.91k £17.55k £34.35k £24.30k £35.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.05k £0 £0 £0 £975.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £785.70k £637.36k £751.67k £919.21k £3.43k
Expenditure - Governance £7.05k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £60.67k £292.47k £308.24k £290.99k £487.98k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £308.48k £312.10k £186.33k £217.54k £200.85k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £230.21k £404.10k £285.43k £340.82k £526.72k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2022 31 March 2023 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 31 March 2023 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holywell Leisure Centre
North Road
Treffynnon
HOLYWELL
CH8 7TQ
Phone:
01352355100
Website:

holywellleisurecentre.com