OPERATION ENCOMPASS

Charity number: 1169147
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sanjana Narang Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Annelise Widdowsson Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
LIS CARNEY-HAWORTH Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Melanie James Trustee 05 June 2015 None on record
Carl Eve Trustee 14 September 2015 None on record
Dr Annemarie Millar Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
DAVID CARNEY Trustee 01 September 2015
SILVER STORIES Recently registered
Camilla Southworth Trustee 14 September 2015 None on record
Richard Ian Marsh Chair 25 January 2019 None on record