Accounts and annual returns I HAVE A FATHER

Charity number: 1169643
Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 59 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 59 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2022 416 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 March 2021 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 March 2022 782 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window