Accounts and annual returns HASTINGS THRIVES

Charity number: 1170342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 20 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 29 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 29 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window