Accounts and annual returns THE DR S C CLARK MEMORIAL FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1168699
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 15 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 15 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 June 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required