Financial history THE DR S C CLARK MEMORIAL FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1168699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £20.67k £13.60k £10.09k £27.95k £1
Total expenditure £37.26k £31.57k £36.95k £30.08k £38.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A