ALLIANCE FRANCAISE DE YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public of York and the surrounding region in French language and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 31 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Egan | Chair | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Harley | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Curran | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.95k | £41.21k | £38.16k | £24.50k | £34.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.41k | £49.94k | £40.41k | £30.62k | £33.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF YORK AND THE SURROUNDING REGION IN FRENCH LANGUAGE AND CULTURE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • ORGANISING COURSES IN FRENCH LANGUAGE, CIVILISATION AND LITERATURE; • PROMOTING SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES, RELATING TO FRANCE AND FOR FRENCH SPEAKERS IN YORK AND SURROUNDING AREA (SUCH AS LECTURES, MUSICAL CONCERTS, DRAMA, EXHIBITIONS, FILM SHOWS); • COLLABORATING WITH THE CULTURAL SERVICE OF THE FRENCH EMBASSY IN LONDON; AND • SUPPORTING FRENCH LANGUAGE TEACHING AND THE DIFFUSION OF FRENCH CULTURE IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MICKLEGATE
YORK
YO1 6JH
- Phone:
- 07904033196
- Email:
- afdeyork@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window