Accounts and annual returns UKRAINIAN INSTITUTE LONDON

Charity number: 1170753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 05 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window