WALL HEATH EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHURCH'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AND APPENDICES ATTACHED TO THIS CONSTITUTION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 06 December 2016: Standard registration
- 15 October 2018: Funds received from 1153720 WALL HEATH EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH
- New Life Church Wall Heath (Working name)
- WHEFC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MATTHEW BRYAN DANIEL JONES | Chair | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Samuel Jones | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Rachel Jones | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Lee Tromans | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PETER EVANS | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JAMES NICHOLAS TROMANS | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN FRANCIS DAY | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN JOHN ORTON | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN YATES | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JONATHAN CRAM | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.59k | £302.08k | £485.00k | £163.67k | £166.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.64k | £76.61k | £94.31k | £112.24k | £174.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £345 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND (C) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WALL HEATH AND DUDLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wall Heath Evangelical Free Church
81 Enville Road
KINGSWINFORD
DY6 0JX
- Phone:
- 07775712776
- Email:
- info@whefc.org
- Website:
-
whefc.org/Home.htm
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window