Trustees THE LEARNED SOCIETY OF WALES
Charity number: 1168622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Faron George Moller | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Ambreena Manji | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Professor Kirsti Bohata | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Qiang Shen FLSW | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Meena Upadhyaya | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Professor John Tucker FLSW | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Professor Alma Harris FLSW | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Claire Gorrara FLSW | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sally Davies | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Iwan Rhys Morus | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr LYNN WILLIAMS FLSW | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PROF IEUAN HUGHES | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR HYWEL THOMAS FLSW | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR HELEN FULTON | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
TERRY ROSLYN THREADGOLD FLSW | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
YR ATHRO KEITH ALAN SHORE | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL CHARLTON FLSW | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.