Accounts and annual returns VVOOSH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1168935
Charity reporting is overdue by 855 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 490 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 490 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 855 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 855 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 July 2020 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 July 2020 172 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 February 2020 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 February 2020 256 days late Download Open in new window