ZEBRAS CHILDREN AND ADULTS CHARITY

Charity number: 1171051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 30 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 22 January 2020 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 22 January 2020 25 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download