Trustees ZENITH YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1169585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Delia Lee Chair 12 January 2017
None on record
Georgia Palmer Trustee 04 January 2022
None on record
Jenny McKim Trustee 23 November 2020
None on record
SCOTT ROGERS Trustee 15 January 2018
None on record
Patricia McSherry Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
Joel White Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
Michelle Tucker Trustee 02 March 2017
None on record
Roy Page Trustee 12 January 2017
None on record
Christopher Jones Trustee 10 October 2016
ST MARKS COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Carol Jones Trustee 10 October 2016
None on record