WENSLEYDALE CONCERT SERIES

Charity number: 1172472
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 January 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 January 2021 63 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)