DOUGLAS VALLEY OUTREACH

Charity number: 1170077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 November 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 November 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 07 November 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 November 2019 04 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 07 November 2018 06 January 2020 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 November 2018 06 January 2020 121 days late Download
Annual return 07 November 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 November 2017 06 February 2018 On time Download