NATIONAL PARK CITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 June 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 21 June 2019 15 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2019 15 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 21 June 2018 09 May 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2018 09 May 2019 18 days late Download