Accounts and annual returns CANOLFAN CYMDEITHASOL Y PARC (PARC COMMUNITY CENTRE)

Charity number: 508634
Charity reporting is overdue by 1576 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 480 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 480 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 845 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 845 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1210 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1576 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1576 days