Financial history CANOLFAN CYMDEITHASOL Y PARC (PARC COMMUNITY CENTRE)

Charity number: 508634
Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £2.22k £10.87k £1.69k £2.34k £2.87k
Total expenditure £1.25k £5.71k £3.23k £2.87k £3.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A