SAMARITANS OF IPSWICH AND EAST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1168725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time Download