SAMARITANS OF IPSWICH AND EAST SUFFOLK

Charity number: 1168725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MARCH 1967 AS AMENDED 9 JULY 1991 , 22 MAY 2006 AND 22 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN IPSWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA), TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION;AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND, TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
IPSWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Registration history
  • 04 August 1967 : Standard registration