Accounts and annual returns SUNNAH SPORTS ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1172620
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 22 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 22 February 2022 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 03 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 03 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 09 April 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 09 April 2020 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window