FIRST LADIES(BARKING AND DAGENHAM) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1169877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our activities are in line with the National Federation of Women's Institutes. At the monthly main meeting we usually have a guest speaker or an activity of interest to our members. During the month further sub groups are held at members' homes or at a suitable location for the activity. E.g. textile or paper crafts, book club, theatre outings, choir, walking group, coffee club, games group etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,138
Total expenditure: £12,818

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bonnie Holland Chair 01 May 2019
None on record
Joanne Savage Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
DORA BOWES Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.06k £4.37k £7.40k £8.21k £12.14k
Total expenditure £9.50k £3.48k £7.40k £7.53k £12.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 SPRINGPOND ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM9 5DP
Phone:
07984439019