OUTSIDE IN ART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a platform for artists excluded from the art world because of mental, physical or other reasons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £101,840 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garret Turley | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Christie | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheryll Catto | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Chappatte | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Jane Rosser Frost | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles Martin | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £439.53k | £937.42k | £462.50k | £601.92k | £425.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457.03k | £357.01k | £476.40k | £571.93k | £584.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £103.12k | £101.84k | £99.56k | £104.50k | £101.84k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £920.65k | N/A | £527.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £11.67k | N/A | £61.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £500.00k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.10k | N/A | £13.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £353.74k | N/A | £533.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £3.27k | N/A | £38.81k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.48k | N/A | £10.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE TO TAKE PART IN ART-RELATED ACTIVITIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); LEARNING DISABILITY; SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; HOMELESSNESS; OR WHO ARE WITHIN, OR HAVE EXPERIENCED THE PENAL SYSTEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Outside In
PO Box 5571
Brighton
BN50 8UR
- Phone:
- 01273 457716
- Email:
- info@outsidein.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window