PENNY JONES ANIMAL HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PJAH holds two public Open Days each year, also fundraising events. Funds raised are put towards ensuring animals in the care of the Charity are happy and have a good quality of life. The main expenditure is the maintenance,upgrading hospice facilties and funding the ongoing veterinary care that comes with caring for older, palliative and disabled animals. We also support neuter schemes abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Macedonia
- Romania
Governance
- 20 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jones | Chair | 16 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Sargent | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MCDONAGH | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.64k | £133.35k | £222.29k | £177.27k | £255.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.57k | £107.61k | £173.42k | £247.38k | £227.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE RESCUE, REHABILITATION AND RE-HOMING OF ABANDONED AND MISTREATED ANIMALS. B) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF ANIMAL WELFARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rigghead Cottage
Hethersgill
CARLISLE
CA6 6HH
- Phone:
- 07554532867
- Email:
- pennyjonescharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window