Accounts and annual returns DOVECOTE VOLUNTARY PARENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1172048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window