Financial history DEVELOPING WORLD HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 1170788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £36.99k £4.11k £20.53k £86.35k £141.25k
Total expenditure £23.09k £3.96k £34.92k £72.33k £90.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £24.38k N/A