BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT

Charity number: 508669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Bateman Trustee 12 December 2017
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Jason Clark Trustee 10 March 2015
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Rena Rani Trustee 11 August 2020
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Parveen Hassan Trustee 29 May 2020
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Raman Dhillon Chair 12 December 2017
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Faye Downs Trustee 29 May 2020 None on record
NIGEL BURBIDGE Trustee 03 May 2012
TRADE SEXUAL HEALTH Received: On time
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Rachel Scott Trustee 12 December 2017
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
SALLY PLUMB Trustee
RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time