SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANIZATION UK

Charity number: 1171445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 04 March 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 June 2019 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required