Accounts and annual returns SAL'S SHOES

Charity number: 1171670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 May 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 15 May 2020 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window