Financial history CYMDEITHAS TREWYDDEL

Charity number: 1169424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £8.12k £7.03k £16.26k £28.17k £7.81k
Total expenditure £7.61k £7.67k £14.98k £16.32k £16.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.84k £27.83k £1.71k