Accounts and annual returns KING'S ESTATE RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 508708
Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 325 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 325 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 690 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 690 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1055 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1055 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1420 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1420 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1786 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1786 days