Accounts and annual returns SYCAMORE HALLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1169184
Charity reporting is overdue by 506 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 August 2022 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 August 2022 201 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2022 566 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 August 2022 566 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 March 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 March 2020 30 days late Download Open in new window