ALMARKAZ UL ISLAMI LTD

Charity number: 1173153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 September 2019 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 September 2019 309 days late Download